Miller v. Stanford Health Care et al

Plaintiff: Danielle Miller
Defendant: Stanford Health Care, Atlantech Medical Device Ltd., ArthroCare Corporation, ArthroCare Medical Corporation, Smith & Nephew, Inc. and Smith & Nephew PLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv02389
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
April 18, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 50 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
January 21, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 43 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/21/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 13, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 40 . Miller is ordered to show cause by 1/20/2016, why the Court should permit her first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/13/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
July 15, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF Defendants Atlantech Medical Device, Inc., ArthroCare Corporation, ArthroCare Medical Corporation, and Smith & Nephew, PLC pursuant to Stipulation 19 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/15/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Stanford Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Miller
Represented By: Ann Olivarius
Represented By: Johnna Gisella Sack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantech Medical Device Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArthroCare Corporation
Represented By: Holiday Dreessen Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArthroCare Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Holiday Dreessen Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?