Johnson v. 7-Eleven, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc, James Herbert Townsend, William Cates and Thu T Cates
Case Number: 5:2015cv02397
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 40 Motion to Set Aside Default (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
November 4, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 11/04/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 29, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 10/29/2015. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. 7-Eleven, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Herbert Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thu T Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?