Witthoeft v. Dollar General Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Witthoeft
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv02408
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
July 23, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER re 23 Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 23, 2015 (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 18, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 18, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)**CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO HON. PAUL S. GREWAL** Modified on 6/18/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 17, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witthoeft v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Witthoeft
Represented By: Peggy Anne Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Killens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?