Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ" v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ"
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02442
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2015 ECF calendar updated, re 24 : ALL calendared events TERMINATED (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot 13 Motion to Strike (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015) **THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE FILE** Modified on 11/16/2015 (sms, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2015 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 22 **CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THURSDAY'S HEARING** Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the pending Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 13 ) suitable for decision without oral argument and hereby VACATES the hearing set for November 5, 2015 at 1:30PM. The November 5, 2015 Initial Case Management Conference IS CONTINUED to January 27, 2016 at 2:00PM. 7-days prior to the CMC, the parties are required to jointly file an updated Case Management Statement, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 16-9. (This is a text-only notice; there is no document associated with this entry.) (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 16, 2015 Per ECF No. 21, case flags updated to reflect selection of Private ADR (sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 16, 2015 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting as modified 20 Stipulation Selecting Mediation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 15, 2015 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook Inc. filed by Facebook Inc.. (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 15, 2015 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
August 14, 2015 18 REPLY (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Special Motion to Strike ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 4, 2015 17 OPPOSITION to ( 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Special Motion to Strike ) filed by Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ". (Pourtavoosi, Babak) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified text on 8/5/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2015 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HON. LUCY H. KOH.** Following re-assignment, this case is now set for an Initial Case Management Conference before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh on 11/5/2015 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. This Conference shall be heard at the same date/time as the pending motion to dismiss. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9. Briefing schedules, including ADR, remain unchanged by the new date, unless otherwise modified by the Court. The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.(sms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 28, 2015 15 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 28, 2015 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 24, 2015 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Special Motion to Strike filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Proposed Order)(Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 21, 2015 12 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/21/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 21, 2015 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc... (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 15, 2015 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by July 29, 2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
June 18, 2015 8 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline To Respond To Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sunita B Bali (Bali, Sunita) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Alger (Alger, Timothy) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 2, 2015 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 2 Proposed Summons. (Pourtavoosi, Babak) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief and Damages against Facebook Inc.. Filed by Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ". ( Filing fee $400., receipt number 0971-9566469 ) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Email correspondence with defendant Facebook Inc)(Pourtavoosi, Babak) (Filed on 6/2/2015) Modified text on 6/2/2015 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ" v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sikhs For Justice Inc. "SFJ"
Represented By: Babak Pourtavoosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Alger
Represented By: Sunita B Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?