Tessera, Inc. v. Toshiba Corporation

Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv02543
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2017 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 336 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF KIMBERLY A. MEYER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/29/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 27, 2017 335 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(B). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
February 13, 2017 309 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE 302 , 304 : ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/13/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
December 27, 2016 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 267 TOSHIBA CORPORATION'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS RELATED TO TOSHIBA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/27/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
December 13, 2016 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 260 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 29, 2016 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 249 JOINT STATUS REPORT FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/29/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 16, 2016 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 239 MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
October 26, 2016 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 212 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF FOR DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/26/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 24, 2016 225 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE: 211 , 213 , 218 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 14, 2016 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 209 TOSHIBA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REDACT PORTIONS OF SEPTEMBER 22, 2016 HEARING TRANSCRIPT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/14/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 24, 2016 183 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE 176 , 178 , 181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/24/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 15, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman granting in part and denying in part 172 . (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 9, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS by Judge Beth L. Freeman denying 139 ; granting in part and denying in part 140 ; granting in part and denying in part 144 . (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 8, 2016 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 164 PLAINTIFF TESSERA,INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 21, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 129 WITHDRAWAL OF NAOMI JANE GRAY AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 14, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTERS FOUR AND FIVE. Re: Dkt. Nos. 113 115 . The parties will file a joint stipulation stating the terms of their resolutions of both discovery disputes by 6/17/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/14/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
April 20, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Re: Dkt. Nos. 95 101 . The Court vacates the April 27 discovery hearing. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/20/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 12, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING MEET AND CONFER AND BRIEFING DEADLINES 98 . If the parties are unable to resolve the issues re 95 , Tessera's opposition to Toshiba's motion for protective order will be due 4/21/2016 and Toshiba's reply on 4/28/2016. Any hearing on Toshiba's motion will be heard 5/4/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/12/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 29, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER to Take Depositions in Tokyo, Japan re 92 Stipulation filed by Toshiba Corporation. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 21, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 88 WITHDRAWAL OF ALALI DAGOGO-JACK AS COUNSEL FOR TOSHIBA CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 2, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING TESSERA'S PROPOSED ORDER SEEKING DEPOSITIONS IN JAPAN. Re: Dkt. No. 69 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/2/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
August 12, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 30 WITHDRAWAL OF LAURA A. SEIGLE AS COUNSEL FOR TESSERA, INC. Attorney Laura Ann Seigle terminated. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/12/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
June 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: (328 in 5:10-cv-04435-EJD, 8 in 5:15-cv-02543-NC) SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. The court has carefully reviewed these actions and finds they are not related according to the requirements provided by Civil Local Rule 3-12. Accordingly, these two cases shall not be related and a reassignment of cases to the undersigned shall not occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 9, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 15-cv-02543 NC with 10-cr-04435 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/9/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessera, Inc. v. Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Joshua Popik Glucoft
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: James Milkey
Represented By: Laura Ann Seigle
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Alali Dagogo-Jack
Represented By: Ali Nooruddin Dhanani
Represented By: David M. Genender
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Represented By: Michael Hawes
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?