InterDigital Technology Corporation et al v. Pegatron Corporation

Plaintiff: InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Inc and IPR Licensing, Inc.
Defendant: Pegatron Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv02584
Filed: June 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 59 Motion to Compel (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
July 7, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 29, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 32 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 10 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 15, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/15/2015. (lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 10, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to file Documents Under Seal signed by Judge Edward J Davila on 6/9/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterDigital Technology Corporation et al v. Pegatron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Inc
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Jose Carlos Villarreal
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPR Licensing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brett Levin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Reed
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Represented By: David Sidney Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegatron Corporation
Represented By: Michele A. Gauger
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Represented By: Hong-An Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?