Peilin Chang v. American Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Peilin Chang
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv02604
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES 112 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re Docket No. 101 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 19, 2017 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING motion to enforce settlement to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/19/2017. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
August 17, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
March 10, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Stipulation Re Docket No. 45 . ( 45 Motion for Sanctions is withdrawn pursuant to the stipulation). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
January 3, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Administrative Motion to Change Time re 45 MOTION for Sanctions. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
August 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION, granting 26 . The deadline to conduct private mediation is extended from 8/31/2016 to 11/18/2016. 2/2/2017 Pretrial Conference and 2/21/2017 Jury Trial to remain as presently set. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/29/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
April 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 19 Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/14/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peilin Chang v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peilin Chang
Represented By: Stephen J. Gorog, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Christian Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Rebekka R. Martorano
Represented By: Timothy John Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?