Ellis v.National Renewable Energy Center

Plaintiff: Terrace Ellis
Defendant: National Renewable Energy Center
Case Number: 5:2015cv02702
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/13/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 9, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 5:14-cv-02702 NC and 3:15-cv-00532 JCS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/9/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 10, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendant must file a case management statement and either consent or decline the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge by October 7. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/10/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v.National Renewable Energy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrace Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Renewable Energy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?