Case v. Hertz Corporation

Plaintiff: James Case
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv02707
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 77 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/21/2016.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
July 15, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 73 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 11:00 AM. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
December 18, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY FOR JANUARY 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/18/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING 25 MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY FOR MARCH 17, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/17/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
October 28, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/28/2015. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Case v. Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Case
Represented By: E. Michelle Drake
Represented By: Joseph C Hashmall
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Robert A. Dolinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?