St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 5:2015cv02744
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part [140-9] Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 131 Travelers' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 132 St. Paul's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 135 Zurich's Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on March 1, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRING THE PARTIES TO PRIVATE MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 10, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on September 16, 2015. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Gary A. Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?