February 5, 2019 |
Filing
213
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (525 in 3:17-cv-01268-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO MEDIATE filed by LivePerson, Inc., (211 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO MEDIATE filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing
204
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (202 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING DATES FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
|
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
197
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (196 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CHANGING DATE FOR CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY AND TRADE SECRET SELECTION filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
195
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (393 in 3:17-cv-01268-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by LivePerson, Inc., (194 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by LivePerson, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
189
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (188 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Deposition Deadline Re: Messrs. Vijayaraghavan and Garikipati filed by 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd., (24)7 .ai, Inc., (373 in 3:17-cv-01268-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Deposition Deadline Re: Messrs. Vijayaraghavan and Garikipati filed by (24)7.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
185
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (183 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Fact Deposition And Expert Report Deadlines filed by LivePerson, Inc., (351 in 3:17-cv-01268-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Fact Deposition And Expert Report Deadlines filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
|
February 20, 2018 |
Filing
182
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (181 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Stay of Patent Actions filed by 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd., (24)7.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
|
February 12, 2018 |
Filing
180
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (179 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadline To File Motions To Compel Regarding Fact Depositions (Non-Expert) filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
|
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
177
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Authenticity of Third Party Documents filed by 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd., 24 7.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
|
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
170
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Deposition Hours filed by 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd., 24 7.ai, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
159
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (158 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss '719 and '715 Patents With Prejudice filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
151
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing Date of Case Management Conference filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
|
May 25, 2017 |
Filing
144
ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
|
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
139
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Request For Case Management Conference with Proposed Order) filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
|
March 13, 2017 |
Filing
129
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule for LivePerson's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
124
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Substitution of Counsel filed by LivePerson, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Filing
122
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd., 24/7 Customer, Inc. filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
|
December 7, 2016 |
Filing
109
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
|
November 21, 2016 |
Filing
105
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss '278 and '438 Patents Without Prejudice filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc., 24/7 Customer International Holdings, Ltd.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
103
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 92 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendant's request to amend the invalidity contentions is granted. Amended invalidity contentions are due by 12/5/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
|
November 3, 2016 |
Filing
100
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (97 in 3:15-cv-02897-JST) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Joint Stipulation requesting permission to use visual presentation equipment in courtroom during technology tutorial and claim construction hearing filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing
90
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Filing Amended Complaints filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
88
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 86 8/12/16 Joint Discovery Letter regarding source code production. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
84
ORDER re 82 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/29/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing
75
ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF; AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re 74 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by LivePerson, Inc. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/8/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
|
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
73
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Invalidity Contentions (Patent L.R. 3-3) 6/20/2016. Exchange of Proposed Terms for Construction (Patent L.R. 4-1) 7/4/2016. Exchange Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Patent L.R. 4-2) 7/25/2016. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Patent L.R. 4-3) 8/16/2016. Close of Claim Construction Discovery (Patent L.R. 4-4) 9/15/2016. Opening Claim Construction Brief (Patent L.R. 4-5) 9/30/2016. Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Pa tent L.R. 4-5) 10/14/2016. Reply Claim Construction Brief (Patent L.R. 4-5) 10/24/2016. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/8/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/6/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
62
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Amended Complaint filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
|
December 18, 2015 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
|
November 19, 2015 |
Filing
48
DUAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
46
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 42 Proposed Order filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing
45
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposed] Stipulated Electronic Discovery Order filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
39
SCHEDULING ORDER. Claim construction discovery cut-off 4/7/2016. Claim construction opening brief 4/22/2016. Claim construction responsive brief 5/13/2016. Claim construction reply brief 5/27/2016. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 30, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER REGARDING ADR PROCESS re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re ADR Process filed by 24/7 Customer, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 3, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
|