Gomez et al v. True Leaf Farms, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rafael Gomez, Cesar Ruelas and Brenda Acevedo
Defendant: True Leaf Farms, LLC, True Leaf Holdings, LLC, Church Brothers, LLC, Tom Church, Steve Church and David Gill
Case Number: 5:2015cv02928
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 71 Application to Allow Plaintiffs' Counsel, Stuart R. Chandler, to appear by CourtCall at the 4/22/2016 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/13/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
October 16, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte Regarding 25 Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action and 38 Motion for Sanctions. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015).
August 11, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 Continuing Case Management Conference and Vacating Other Pending Deadlines. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/11/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez et al v. True Leaf Farms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Gomez
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Ruelas
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Acevedo
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Leaf Farms, LLC
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Leaf Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Church
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Church
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gill
Represented By: Michael Christopher Saqui
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Schermerhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?