HVAC Technology LLC v. Southland Industries

Plaintiff: HVAC Technology LLC
Defendant: Southland Industries
Case Number: 5:2015cv02934
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/2/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
November 10, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/14/2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/10/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 9, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re November 17, 2016 Hearing. Motion Hearing re 52 , 66 , 67 , 69 set for 12/15/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/17/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/9/2016. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
July 29, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 52 First MOTION for Summary Judgment OF LITERAL INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIM 8 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,478,761 filed by HVAC Technology LLC. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/29/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 20, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/20/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
June 14, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Magistrate Kandis A. Westmore on 6/14/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 2, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 2, 2016, re 27 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 8, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal re 34 , 35 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
September 22, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 22, 2015, re 22 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HVAC Technology LLC v. Southland Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southland Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HVAC Technology LLC
Represented By: Mark David Marrello
Represented By: T. Lester Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?