Valencia v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Daniel Stephen Valencia
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2015cv03048
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 28 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 30 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment and close this file. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/20/2017 (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATEMENT OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/15/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
March 16, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding Filing of Answer and Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/16/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 15, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 03/15/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stephen Valencia
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?