Mathieu v. Equifax Inc.

Plaintiff: Darrell Mathieu
Defendant: Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Patelco Credit Union and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 5:2015cv03053
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motions terminated as MOOT: 46 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
January 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Because the parties have since complied with its requirements and demonstrated good cause in response, the Order to Show Cause issued on January 5, 2016 (Docket Item No. 36), is DISCHARGED. The hearing scheduled for January 14, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 5, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 1/7/2016. In doing so, however, they must (1) explain their failure to comply with the original deadline to file one of the ADR forms, and (2) must also file one of the forms contemplated by the December 12th Order. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward. J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/5/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 21, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court resets the Case Management Conference for 10:00 a.m. on 12/17/2015. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 12/10/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/21/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 5, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court issues the instant OSC requiring that Plaintiff, no later than 10/8/2015, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Experian; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished. In light of this order, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/8/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 15, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Amended filed by Darrell Mathieu; Terminating as moot 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Wells Fargo Bank (National Association) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/15/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 11, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Patelco Credit Union. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank. Response due 8/29/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 8, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation Extending the Date to Respond to the Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank. Response due by 7/30/2015 as to Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathieu v. Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patelco Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Steven Mitchell Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Mathieu
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?