Reyes v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Reyes
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03084
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re-Setting Briefing and Hearing Dates re Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss. 3/29/2016 Status Conference vacated. Plaintiff's opposition due by 4/12/2016. Reply due by 4/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/25/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
February 23, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Show Cause Hearing. Further status conference set for 3/29/2016, 1:30 PM. Joint status report due by 3/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/23/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 plaintiff's request for continuance. Show Cause hearing remains set for 2/23/2016, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/22/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Plaintiff's counsel's declaration due by 2/19/2016. Plaintiff's counsel Edward Ramirez to appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 2/23/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/16/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 6, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re-Setting Deadlines re 11 Wells Fargo's MOTION to Dismiss and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Hearing on motion to dismiss set for 2/16/2016, 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's opposition due by 1/19/2016. Wells Fargo's reply due by 1/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 4/5/2016, 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/6/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
September 15, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. 9/22/2015 hearing re defendant's motion to dismiss vacated, without prejudice. Case Management Statement or further status report due by 11/3/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/15/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 18, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/18/2015. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Reyes
Represented By: Edward Robert Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?