Melendez v. USA

Plaintiff: Rafael Melendez
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 5:2015cv03103
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Responses due by 2/24/2016. Replies due by 2/26/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/19/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 11, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED AMENDED ORDER re 52 Order AND 51 Order on Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/11/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 10, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2015. Government's response due by 12/4/2015. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/9/2015.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/10/15. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Melendez
Represented By: Edward O.C. Ord
Represented By: Cheng Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?