Coulter v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joy Coulter
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Barclay's Bank Delaware, Capital One Financial Corporation, Credit One Bank, N.A., First National Credit Card, Inc., Synchrony Bank, The Toronto-Dominion Bank and United Finance
Case Number: 5:2015cv03122
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT UNITED FINANCE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; AND DIRECTING CLERK TO TERMINATE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/6/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 7, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Motion for Default Judgment due by 7/1/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
January 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; (2) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT UNITED FINANCE WITHIN 30 DAYS; AND (3) DISMISSING DEFENDANT FIRST NATIONAL CREDIT CARD WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 13, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/21/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 11, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING 23 HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Coulter
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclay's Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Credit Card, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Veronica Kuiumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toronto-Dominion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?