Michele McGee v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Michelle McGee
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Credit One Bank, National Association, Discover Bank, GE Capital Bank, Nordstrom FSB, Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Wachovia Dealer Services, Inc., Comenity Bank, Credit Bureau Associates and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 5:2015cv03124
Filed: July 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michelle McGee. Nordstrom FSB terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
October 27, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michelle McGee. Wachovia Dealer Services, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 9, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/9/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 23, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Discover Bank filed by Michelle McGee. Discover Bank terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2015. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 11, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michelle McGee 27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michelle McGee. Wells Fargo Dealer Services terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 31, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Equifax filed by Michelle McGee. Equifax, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 11, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Credit One Bank. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michele McGee v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McGee
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Capital Bank
Represented By: Veronica Kuiumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Dealer Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Bureau Associates
Represented By: Mark Ewell Ellis
Represented By: Brandon L. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Veronica Kuiumdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?