Eric Ballard v. Lumenis Inc.

Plaintiff: Eric Ballard
Defendant: Lumenis Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03164
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 72 plaintiffs' Motion to Approve Settlement. Case dismissed with prejudice. The clerk shall close this file. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
June 22, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 69 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
May 11, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 56 defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Proposed notice to be submitted by 5/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 22, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 53 plaintiffs' motion to amend complaint. Amended pleading to be filed forthwith as a separate docket entry on ECF. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Ballard v. Lumenis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ballard
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumenis Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Halberda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?