Andrade v. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Miriam Andrade
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Altamira Corporation and Petro Mota
Case Number: 5:2015cv03175
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES. Re: Dkt. No. 87 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/6/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 3, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. No. 87 . Andrade must respond this order by 8/17/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/3/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 19, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PEDRO MOTA 85 . Plaintiff to file an updated case management statement within 14 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
April 5, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 27,2016, 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/5/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
January 25, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Re: Dkt. Mo. 56 . Defendant Mota must appear at the January 27 case management conference pro se or with counsel. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/25/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 1, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NOTIFYING DEFENDANTS OF COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY. Re: Dkt. No. 42 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/1/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 3, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ARG'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Re: Dkt. Nos. 20-36. Andrade may amend her complaint and must submit it by 11/17/2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
August 11, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint, Dkt. No. 7, by 8/14/2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/11/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrade v. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Andrade
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Hope A. Case
Represented By: Shirley Shu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altamira Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Mota
Represented By: Lynnette Marie Ariathurai, Mrs.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?