City Of San Jose v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: City Of San Jose
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Solutia Inc and Pharmacia Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv03178
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 147 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF ORDER FOR APPEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 29, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 4, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 123 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
February 3, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 103 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
August 22, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS granting (65) in case 5:15-cv-03178-EJD; granting (49) in case 5:15-cv-05152-EJD; granting (39) in case 5:16-cv-00071-EJD. Leave to amend is granted only as to the Cities' nuisance causes of action. Any amended complaints shall be filed on or before September 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 22, 2016. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
April 7, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER - DENYING TRANSFER. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
November 23, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases: Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), the above-entitled case is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for consideration of whether the case is related to City of San Jose v. Monsanto Company, 15-cv-03178-EJD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/23/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Of San Jose v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Carla Michelle Burke
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Celeste Andrea Evangelisti
Represented By: John Paul Fiske
Represented By: Nora Valerie Frimann
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia Inc
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer P. Casler-Goncalves
Represented By: Andrea Maria Hogan
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Represented By: Kelly Eugene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?