DARNAA, LLC v. Google, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DARNAA, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc. and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv03221
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ALTER THE JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 81 Motion to Alter Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/21/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/14/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING 59 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 15 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DARNAA, LLC v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARNAA, LLC
Represented By: Michael Richard Shapiro
Represented By: Terran T. Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?