Finjan, Inc. v. Blue Coat Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Coat Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03295
Filed: July 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2017 368 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 350 360 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 4, 2017 336 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 321 323 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/4/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 27, 2017 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ONIMBUS ORDER REGARDING 300 305 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/27/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
August 4, 2017 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 282 BLUE COAT SYSTEMS, LLC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/4/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
June 19, 2017 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 260 BLUE COAT SYSTEMS LLC'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS AMENDED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/19/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 13, 2017 258 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 245 , 249 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/13/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 8, 2017 251 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 238 240 242 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
May 30, 2017 235 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER REGARDING 226 227 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/30/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 15, 2017 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 222 MOTION TO SEAL AN EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/15/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 9, 2017 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 217 BLUE COAT SYSTEMS LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/9/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 28, 2017 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 205 BLUE COAT SYSTEMS LLC'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/28/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 27, 2017 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 150 FINJAN, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/27/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
February 2, 2017 181 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (In re: ECF Nos. 151 and 174 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/31/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 13, 2016 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 104 BLUE COATS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2016. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 22, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 71 FINJAN'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/22/2016. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 14, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 64 FINJAN'S MOTION TO STRIKE BLUE COAT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/14/2016. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 2, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting Dkt. Nos. 106 and 118 , Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 24, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 111 , 124 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
September 1, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 88 SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2016.blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 17, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 70 , 80 MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 24, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 22, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 29 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/22/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 13, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MOVING HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY TO 2 P.M. ON APRIL 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
July 28, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP (Re: Case No. 13-cv-3999-BLF and 15-cv-3295-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/28/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Blue Coat Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Represented By: James R. Hannah
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Coat Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Olivia M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?