Western Alliance Bank v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Plaintiff: Western Alliance Bank
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 5:2015cv03429
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 43 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 18, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 11 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Alliance Bank v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Alliance Bank
Represented By: Steven Joel Brower
Represented By: Suzanne Margaret Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?