Boyd v. United States Department of Treasury et al

Plaintiff: Michael E Boyd
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury, Jack Lew, Jerry Brown, Michael Cohen, Betty Yee and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 5:2015cv03494
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 100 , 101 , 102 , 105 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING 115 REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/27/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
November 29, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 106 LEAVE TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES. 101 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 105 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Michael Boyd's First Amended Complaint and Notice Thereof, 100 MOTION to Dismiss, 102 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Amended First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 12/9/2016. Replies due by 12/16/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/29/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 15, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 98 JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 9, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 82 REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND GRANTING 95 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/9/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
October 24, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 81 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND GRANTING 88 EX PARTE APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2016. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
August 15, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 , 40 , 42 , 45 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
May 13, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS AND ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MAY 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
January 4, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISSOLVING 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 7, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court (1) ORDER DENYING 13 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DELAY OF SUBMISSION AND ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS AND (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/12/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
October 15, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 11 RE: REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/15/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. United States Department of Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?