ArcSoft, Inc. v. CyberLink Corp. et al

Plaintiff: ArcSoft, Inc.
Defendant: CyberLink Corp., Perfect Corp. and Perfect Corp. (Cayman Islands)
Case Number: 5:2015cv03707
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE granting 75 Stipulation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
March 7, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 63 Motion to Dismiss. Cyberlink's motion to dismiss is DENIED. It shall answer the First Amended Complaint within ten days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
December 28, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD, FOURTH, AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge William H. Orrick granting 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 24, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2015)
November 19, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Time to file Reply as to 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Reply due by 12/1/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
September 15, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE, HEARING ON ARCSOFT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION, AND DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, AND RE: DEFENDANT'S ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS. Reset D eadlines as to 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 11/10/2015. Reply due by 11/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/15/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ArcSoft, Inc. v. CyberLink Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ArcSoft, Inc.
Represented By: Otto Oswald Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CyberLink Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Corp. (Cayman Islands)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?