Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Ha

Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Lam Hoang Ha
Case Number: 5:2015cv03721
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/3/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 14, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing Date and Modify Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Adobe Systems Incorporated's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Court against Defendant Lam Hoang Ha. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 4, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 25 to Modify Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Adobe Systems Incorporated's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Court against Defendant Lam Hoang Ha. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Jason Robert Vener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lam Hoang Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?