Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. v. Methode Electronics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mellanox Technologies, Ltd.
Defendant: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv03730
Filed: August 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/14/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 89 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 90 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
July 20, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
March 4, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
September 14, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/14/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. v. Methode Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellanox Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: Xavier Mark Brandwajn
Represented By: Michael S. Connor
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methode Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?