Murphy v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Beri Murphy
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv03799
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Transfer Signed by the MDL Panel. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 28, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 AMENDED STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Stipulation at 57 terminated as moot. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 11:00 AM. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
April 1, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
January 12, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 39 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' FILING OF AN AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 11:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/12/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beri Murphy
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Represented By: Timothy J. Rozelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Abraham Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?