Sovath v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Karen Sovath
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., V.W. Credit, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, Nordstrom fsb, General Electric Capital Retail Bank and Toyota Financial Services
Case Number: 5:2015cv03849
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 76 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, without prejudice)filed by Karen Sovath. Toyota Financial Services terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/20/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 15, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 74 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Karen Sovath. Nordstrom fsb terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
January 22, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 65 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Karen Sovath, General Electric Capital Retail Bank terminated; Terminating 42 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed by General Electric Capital Retail Bank, Motions terminated: 42 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) filed by General Electric Capital Retail Bank. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/22/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 20, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Karen Sovath, 51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Karen Sovath. Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/20/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 18, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Karen Sovath. V.W. Credit, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
October 23, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Dismissal of TransUnion LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 6, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) Plaintiff and MORI hereby stipulate that MORI' s deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to and including October 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 30, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation Extending Time to File Response filed by General Electric Capital Retail Bank. The parties stipulate and agree that Synchrony's response to the Complaint shall be due no later than October 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sovath v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Sovath
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Sonia Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.W. Credit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom fsb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Capital Retail Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?