Lee Darnell Watson v. City of San Jose (San Jose Police Department) et al

Plaintiff: Lee Darnell Watson
Defendant: City of San Jose (San Jose Police Department), Matthew Brackett, Ryan Hansen and Ronald Hughes
Case Number: 5:2015cv04054
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Re: Dkt. No. 121 . Mr. Sehat and Ms. Cliff must file a joint statement clarifying who represents Mr. Watson 12/5/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/30/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
May 12, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING OUTCOME OF CRIMINAL MATTER 28 . Updated Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/12/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
February 17, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 26 . Case stayed until 5/20/2016 or further court order. Parties to file joint status report by 5/20/2016. Deadline for completion of ENE is extended to 150 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/17/2016. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee Darnell Watson v. City of San Jose (San Jose Police Department) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Darnell Watson
Represented By: Cameron Sehat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose (San Jose Police Department)
Represented By: Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brackett
Represented By: Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hansen
Represented By: Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Hughes
Represented By: Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?