Pepper, N.A. v. Expandi, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Pepper, N.A.
Defendant: Expandi, Inc., Expandi, Ltd. and NetPartnering, Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04066
Filed: September 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JURY VERDICT. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/31/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 16, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS. Plaintiff must respond to defendants' objections in docket numbers 100 and 101 by midnight, May 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/16/16. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 15, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court [DRAFT] FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/15/16. (nclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2016)
May 14, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/14/16. (nclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2016)
May 13, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT VENTURE AND UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/13/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 12, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES CLAIM. Plaintiff must state with particularity its theories of liability under the California Unfair Business Practices Act, and also state when and how Pepper disclosed each theory to defendants by Friday, May 13 at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/12/16. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS beginning 5/17/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/11/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 10, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/10/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 9, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SPECIFY EACH CATEGORY OF DAMAGES. By May 11 at noon, plaintiff must file a chart that specifies its computation of each category of damages. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/9/2016. (nclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
May 5, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING THE PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF ALL WITNESSES AT TRIAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/5/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 4, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JOINT TRIAL READINESS BINDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/4/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 22, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 46 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 21, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Pepper must submit a declaration that authenticates exhibits B, D, H, I, J, L, and M, in Dkt. No. 51 , by 5:00 PM on 4/25/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/21/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
March 28, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
November 30, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. 15 . Defendants must answer the complaint within 14 days. Case management conference set for 12/9/2015 10:00 AM. The parties must submit a case management statement by 12/2/2015, which should include a proposed case schedule. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 17, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. No. 15 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/17/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
October 29, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Defendants must file a reply or a notice that none will be filed by 10/30/2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/29/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper, N.A. v. Expandi, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pepper, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Leonard Dworkin
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: John T VanGeffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expandi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expandi, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetPartnering, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?