Fitbit, Inc. v. AliphCom et al
Plaintiff: Fitbit, Inc.
Defendant: AliphCom and BodyMedia, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04073
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REGARDING 180 SEPTEMBER 22, 2017 JOINT DISCOVERY STATEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/25/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING 146 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING 88 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/27/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting Dkt. No. 111 Motion For Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. The court finds this matter suitable for determination without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 90 Motion for Sanctions. The hearing scheduled for 10/27/2016 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/25/2016. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for June 30, 2016, is VACATED. NO APPEARANCE NEEDED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/27/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Bifurcate and Stay the Antitrust Counterclaim. Signed by Edward J. Davila on 5/27/2016 (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitbit, Inc. v. AliphCom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AliphCom
Represented By: Erin Lindsay Calkins
Represented By: Edgar G. Sargent
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BodyMedia, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Lindsay Calkins
Represented By: Edgar G. Sargent
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne M. Barsky
Represented By: Frederick S. Chung
Represented By: Josh A. Krevitt
Represented By: Stuart Mattison Rosenberg
Represented By: Alison Roberta Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?