Mendoza v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.

Plaintiff: Sylvia Mendoza
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04229
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 22, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON 37 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO MAY 12, 2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
January 29, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECTION 17200 CLAIM WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?