Che v. Express Fashions Operations, LLC

Plaintiff: Ngoc Lam Che
Defendant: Express Fashions Operations, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04236
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE. Case dismissed with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/17/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 16, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. All previously scheduled deadlines and appearances are vacated. Stipulated dismissal to be filed by 7/15/2016. If dismissal not filed by that date, then parties to file Show Cause Response by 7/19/2016 and appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 7/26/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/16/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 10, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Che v. Express Fashions Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ngoc Lam Che
Represented By: Pamela Tsao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Fashions Operations, LLC
Represented By: John Garland Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?