Magee v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Magee
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., MUFG Union Bank, National Association and Macy's, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04258
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT. Because Plaintiff did not comply with the order filed on 5/19/2016, all claims against MUFG Union Bank, National Association, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 19, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. On or before 5:00 p.m. on May 31, 2016, Plaintiff shall file or cause to be filed a stipulation for dismissal of her claims against the sole remaining defendant, MUFG Union Bank, in light of the settlement. Plaintiff is a dvised that unless as a dismissal is filed by the deadline previously indicated, the court will dismiss her claims against MUFG Union Bank on June 1, 2016, pursuant to the Order to Show Cause filed on March 15, 2016 (Dkt. No. 31). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 8, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Plaintiff is a dvised that an order to show cause remains pending and has not been discharged. Dkt. No. 31 . Accordingly, any additional failure to comply with deadlines may result in the dismissal of this action without further advance notice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/8/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 15, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 3/18/2016. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
February 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Since the court accepts Plaintiff's explanation on behalf of the parties, the order filed on February 18th is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for 3/3/2016, is VACATED. Consistent with Plaintiff's representation, a stipulation for dismissal of MUFG or a statement explaining why such dismissal has not been completed shall be filed on or before 3/12/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/29/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 18, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear on 3/3/2016 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 2/25/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
November 6, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Request and Stipulation to Continue Date For Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A.'s Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Magee
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?