Dorothy Felton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Felton
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., WebBank, Travis Federal Credit Union, Twin County Credit Union, Unitus Community Credit Union, Capital One, National Association and Dr. Leonard's Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 5:2015cv04274
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for 6/2/2016 is VACATED. The court schedules this case for a Further Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 8/18/2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 8/11/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/27/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 24, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear on 6/2/2016 at 10:00 a.m. to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions for willful disobedience of a court order. The parties may file a response to this order demonstrating good cause why sanctions should not be imposed on or before 5/27/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 12, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER RE: ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. In light of the dismissal of all other defendants, Plaintiff and Defendant Travis Federal Credit Union shall, within ten days of the date this order is filed, meet and confer in an effort to reach an agreement on some form of alternative dispute resolution, and within that same timeframe file either a stipulation embodying their agreement or the form entitled "Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference." Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
February 24, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 42 AMENDED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Dorothy Felton. Equifax, Inc. terminated. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated per 46 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
November 20, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation filed by Dr. Leonard's Healthcare Corporation. Dr. Leonard's Healthcare Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorothy Felton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Felton
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Leora R. Ragones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin County Credit Union
Represented By: Leora R. Ragones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitus Community Credit Union
Represented By: Leora R. Ragones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Leonard's Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Judith Therese Sethna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?