LSI Corporation et al v. Funai Electric Company Ltd et al

Plaintiff: LSI Corporation, Agere Systems Inc and Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Defendant: Funai Electric Company, Ltd., Funai Corporation, Inc., Funai Service Corporation and P and F USA Inc
Case Number: 5:2015cv04307
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 29, 2016 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 113 Stipulation and Order, Amending Stipulation regarding Representative Accused Products filed by Funai Service Corporation, Funai Corporation, Inc., P and F USA Inc, Funai Electric Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/29/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 11, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting Claims Construction Hearing from 5/2/2016 & 5/3/2016 to 5/9/2016 01:00 PM, 5/10/2016 09:30 AM, and 5/13/2016 09:30 AM if needed. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 4, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Representative Accused Products filed by Funai Service Corporation, Funai Corporation, Inc., P and F USA Inc, Funai Electric Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 30, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ALL COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE JANUARY 5, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by LSI Corporation, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Agere Systems Inc. DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 21, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 106 re Further Continuation of the Deadline for Defendants' Patent L.R. 3-4 Disclosures filed by Funai Service Corporation, Funai Corporation, Inc., P and F USA Inc, Funai Electric Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 15, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Continuation of Deadline for Defendants' Patent L.R. 3-4 Disclosures filed by Funai Service Corporation, Funai Corporation, Inc., P and F USA Inc, Funai Electric Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 10, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Administrative Relief filed by LSI Corporation, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd., Agere Systems Inc Status Report due by 12/29/2015. Status Conference reset from 1/14/2016 to 1/5/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 8, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/18/2016 02:30 PM and 4/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/2/2016, 5/3/2016 AND 5/6/2016 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 25, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Funai Service Corporation, Funai Corporation, Inc., P and F USA Inc, Funai Electric Company, Ltd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 20, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 Stipulation Regarding Final Pre-Trial Conference filed by LSI Corporation, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Agere Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 2, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL re 85 Joint Case Management Statement filed by LSI Corporation, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd., Agere Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 13, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 74 to Request Transfer of the ITC Record to the District Court. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LSI Corporation et al v. Funai Electric Company Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Kenneth S. Chang
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agere Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Kenneth S. Chang
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Matthew C. Holohan
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Electric Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Jared A Brandyberry
Represented By: R Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: David A. Mancino
Represented By: Alexander P Ott
Represented By: Scott Richard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Jared A Brandyberry
Represented By: R Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: David A. Mancino
Represented By: Alexander P Ott
Represented By: Scott Richard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funai Service Corporation
Represented By: Jared A Brandyberry
Represented By: R Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: David A. Mancino
Represented By: Alexander P Ott
Represented By: Scott Richard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P and F USA Inc
Represented By: Jared A Brandyberry
Represented By: R Scott Feldmann
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: David A. Mancino
Represented By: Alexander P Ott
Represented By: Scott Richard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?