Mulvany v. Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dana Mulvany
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainent, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04371
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 31 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/14/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
May 19, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBMITTING 21 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; VACATING HEARING ON 21 MOTION; GRANTING 21 MOTION; AND DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED MODIFIED CASE SCHEDULE. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2016. Proposed modified case schedule due by 6/3/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
February 3, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/3/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulvany v. Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Mulvany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainent, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F. Hurley
Represented By: Bradley James Leimkuhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?