In Re: Anton Andrew Rivera; Denise Ann Rivera

Appellant: Anton Andrew Rivera and Denise Ann Rivera
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Case Number: 5:2015cv04402
Filed: September 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming Bankruptcy Court Order Dismissing Debtors' Chapter 13 Bankruptcy. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/15/2017. In light of ORDER, 24 Motion to Expedite and 25 Motion to Expedite are moot. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified on 9/15/2017 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Appellants do not, by 12/20/2016, file an opening brief as previously directed or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
May 3, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. 1. On or before 5/6/2016, Appellants shall file a notice with evidence attached demonstrating they ordered the transcripts and made the requisite payment for such transcripts on 4/29/2016, as represented in their response. 2. In addition, Appellants shall investigate the status of the record in this action. Appellants shall thereafter file a brief declaration detailing the efforts made to secure the record and providing any other pertinent informa tion on or before 5/13/2016. Appellants are advised that the Order to Show Cause remains pending and has not been discharged. Accordingly, any failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action without further advance notice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/3/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 14, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, the court hereby issues an order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If Appellants do not, by 4/22/2016, demonstrate good cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) and/or Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8003(a)(2) and 8009(g). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J.Davila on 4/14/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
November 9, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 30, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re: 3 Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Any opposition be filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on 11/2/2015. Any reply shall be filed on or before 4:00 p.m. on 11/4/2015. The matter will be deemed submitted unless the court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/30/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Anton Andrew Rivera; Denise Ann Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anton Andrew Rivera
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Denise Ann Rivera
Represented By: Ronald Henry Freshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Philip Alan McLeod
Represented By: Stefan Perovich
Represented By: David Doss Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?