Zaman v. Kelly Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Adeel Zaman
Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04601
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on 73 and 75 motions for attorney fees signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/30/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
January 11, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 44 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The court, finding this matter suitable for determination without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), vacates the hearing set for 1/17/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
September 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 30 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaman v. Kelly Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeel Zaman
Represented By: Jon Richard Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Services, Inc.
Represented By: E. Joseph Connaughton
Represented By: Freyaan Y Karanjia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?