Terrie Money v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Terrie Money
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Capital One, National Association, Synchrony Bank and CitiBank USA, National Association
Case Number: 5:2015cv04614
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT STIPULATED CASE SCHEDULE; AND TERMINATING AS MOOT REQUESTS FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2 016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 1/12/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 11, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING 12 HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrie Money v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Money
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank USA, National Association
Represented By: Michael David Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?