Stewart v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc., Capital One, National Association and AFNI, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04617
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 DEFENDANT CAPITAL ONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 7, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 37 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Management Statement due 06/30/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 07/07/2016 at 11:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 10:30 PM. Jury Se lection set for 11/13/2017 at 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017, 11/14/2017, 11/15/2017, 11/16/2017, 11/17/2017, 11/20/2017, 11/21/2017, 11/22/2017 and 11/23/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 01/07/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 11, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING 18 HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stewart
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Meyers
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co-Operative Adjustment Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph L. Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Chelsea Lynn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?