Johnson v. Berger et al

Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Defendant: Albert A. Berger, Paul K. Berger, Pamela S. Kelley and Randy A. Kelley
Case Number: 5:2015cv04632
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/13/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
August 2, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Case Management Conference set for August 18, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement due August 11, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/2/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 25, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/25/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Berger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert A. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul K. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy A. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?