Rowley v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Rowley
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Auto Resources, Inc., USA Discounters, Ltd. and WebBank
Case Number: 5:2015cv04651
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT. All claims against Auto Resources, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute.The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 8, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 7/13/2016, either (1) file a Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Auto Resources Inc. or (2) demonstrate good cause in writing why the claims should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss them with prejudice. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
April 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 4/21/2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A hearing on Plaintiff's anticipated Motion for Default Judgment is scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on July 21, 2016. Plaintiff shall file the motion on or before June 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 11, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. In addition, Plaintiff shall request the clerk enter the default of Auto Resources, Inc., or shall otherwise resolve or dismiss the claims against it, on or before 4/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/11/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
February 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph Rowley, USA Discounters, Ltd. terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowley v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rowley
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Discounters, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Alexander Marcus Porcaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?