Xiangkai Xu v. China Sunergy (US) Clean Tech Inc. et al

Petitioner: Xiangkai Xu
Respondent: China Sunergy (US) Clean Tech Inc., China Sunergy (Hongkong) Co., Ltd. and China Sunergy Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2015cv04823
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 2, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 45 , 46 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 50 , and 51 , applications to examine third persons without prejudice. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
July 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part 16 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiangkai Xu v. China Sunergy (US) Clean Tech Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Xiangkai Xu
Represented By: Rafael Reuben Pacquing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: China Sunergy (US) Clean Tech Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: China Sunergy (Hongkong) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: China Sunergy Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?