Yanushkevich v. Fry's Electronics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dmitry Yanushkevich
Defendant: Fry's Electronics, Inc., SI 43, LLC and SI 11, LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv04830
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2017. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
June 6, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON 33 UNOPPOSED APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS SI 11, LLC AND SI 43, LLC FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/6/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
July 21, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBMITTING 16 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER SITE INSPECTION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT AND VACATING HEARING; AND GRANTING 16 MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/21/2016 (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
April 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING ON 16 MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION. Responses due by 5/12/2016. Replies due by 5/19/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/28/2016. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanushkevich v. Fry's Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitry Yanushkevich
Represented By: Irakli M. Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry's Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Lawrence Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SI 43, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SI 11, LLC
Represented By: Michael D. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?