Intuitive Surgical, Inc. v. Illinois Union Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company and Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv04834
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Intuitive's Complaint Against Illinois Union With Prejudice filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
September 15, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request for Dismissal of Claim Against Navigators With Prejudice filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
April 14, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
January 29, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 13 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 23, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS (DEFENDANT ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT) filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 22, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS AND CONTINUE HEARING (DEFENDANT NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO.S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by Intuitive Surgical, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 22, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intuitive Surgical, Inc. v. Illinois Union Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Raoul Dion Kennedy
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Represented By: James Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?