Monica v. Williams, et al

Plaintiff: Martin Monica
Defendant: Bryan Williams, Officer Erickson, Officer P. Estes and City of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2015cv04857
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 85 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/31/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 43 , 44 , 45 , 46 , 47 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/30/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
December 20, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/20/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
September 19, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/19/2016. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment due 10/27/2016. Defendants' reply due 11/3/2016. Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2016 at 9:00 a.m. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monica v. Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Monica
Represented By: Anthony Boskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer P. Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?